GA HB156 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 45-9-85 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to payment for indemnification for death or disability, procedure for making of payments, and appeal, so as to change provisions relative to the indemnification of injured state highway employees; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Indemnification payment; injured state highway employees; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #335 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #317 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Vote #89 - Passage (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #317 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House Vote #89 - Passage (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 195 | |
2011-05-12 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-03 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-03 | House First Readers |