GA HB1502 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Paulding County Airport Authority, approved April 3, 1972 (Ga. L. 1972, p. 3645), so as to revise the membership of the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Paulding County Airport Authority; revise membership
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Kimberly New [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Rep. Tyler Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #823 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #728 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #728 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Hopper |