GA HB150 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to prohibit governmental entities from adopting any policy that prohibits the connection or reconnection of any utility service based upon the type or source of energy or fuel; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities and public transportation; prohibit governmental entities from adopting any policy that prohibits the connection or reconnection of any utility service based upon the type or source of energy or fuel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #348 (Y: 107 N: 52 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #241 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 42nd: Senate Vote #240 (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #66 (Y: 103 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2021-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-22SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-11SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback