GA HB1494 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the Board of Commissioners of Pierce County, approved March 24, 1937 (Ga. L. 1937, p. 1397), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 14, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 4189), and an Act approved April 19, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 4210), so as to create the office of county manager; to prescribe powers and duties; to provide that the chairperson of the Pierce County Board of Commissioners shall serve on a part-time basis; to provide for a salary; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pierce County Board of Commissioners; office of county manager; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #810 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 582 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-04-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-13 | House Second Readers | |
2010-04-12 | House First Readers |