GA HB149 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to allow for certain elections to be made by Subchapter "S" corporations and partnerships for the filing of tax returns and imposition of taxes; to provide for definitions; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; certain elections to be made by Subchapter "S" corporations and partnerships for the filing of tax returns and imposition of taxes; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #239 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #237 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #79 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #237 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #79 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 164 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House Hopper |