GA HB1483 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Washington, Georgia, approved February 14, 1958 (Ga. L. 1958, p. 2139), as amended, so as to provide for term limits for the offices of mayor and councilmember; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to provide for mandatory execution of election and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Washington, City of; offices of mayor and councilmember; provide term limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #712 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #701 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #701 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Effective Date 2024-05-06 | |
2024-05-06 | Act 686 | |
2024-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Hopper |