GA HB1480 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the board of commissioners of Clinch County, approved March 9, 1933 (Ga. L. 1933, p. 456), as amended, so as to change the composition and manner of election of the governing authority of Clinch County; to provide for the selection of a chairperson; to provide for submission under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clinch County; composition and election of governing authority; change
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Shaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #743 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-28 | Act 519 | |
2010-05-28 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-04-01 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-31 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-30 | House First Readers |