GA HB147 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for a school safety and anti-gang endorsement for eligible certificated professional personnel issued by the Professional Standards Commission; to require school safety plans to be submitted to the Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency; to require intruder alert drills in all public schools in this state; to require public schools to report completion of such drills to the Georgia Emergency Management and Homeland Security Agency; to provide for parents and guardians to opt their children out of such drills; to provide for a definition; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Safe Schools Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Will Wade [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] | Rep. Chris Erwin [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Sen. Mike Hodges [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #214 (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 6th: Senate Vote #213 (Y: 25 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 9th: Senate Vote #212 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amend #1a By Sen From The 9th To Amend #1 By Sen From The 9th: Senate Vote #211 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 2nd: Senate Vote #210 (Y: 22 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #86 (Y: 148 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 6th: Senate Vote #213 (Y: 25 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 9th: Senate Vote #212 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amend #1a By Sen From The 9th To Amend #1 By Sen From The 9th: Senate Vote #211 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 2nd: Senate Vote #210 (Y: 22 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #86 (Y: 148 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-04-13 | Act 7 | |
2023-04-13 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-31 | House | House Hopper |