GA HB1464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the Georgia Bureau of Investigation, so as to provide the Georgia Bureau of Investigation with original jurisdiction to investigate election fraud and election crimes; to provide the Georgia Bureau of Investigation with subpoena power to further such investigations; to provide for penalty; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Bureau of Investigation; original jurisdiction to investigate election fraud and election crimes; provide
Sponsors
Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #748 (Y: 70 N: 101 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #747 (Y: 98 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #747 (Y: 98 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House Hopper |