GA HB1437 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective Date 2022-04-26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective Date 2022-04-26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to revise the rates of taxation on income; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; revise rates of taxation on income
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #870 (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #902 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #804 (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1421, Hb 1291, Hb 1437, Hb 428, Hb 923, Hb 1039, Hb 1058, Hb 1280, Hr 594, Hr 732, Hr 842: Senate Vote #776 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #639 (Y: 115 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #902 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #804 (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 1421, Hb 1291, Hb 1437, Hb 428, Hb 923, Hb 1039, Hb 1058, Hb 1280, Hr 594, Hr 732, Hr 842: Senate Vote #776 (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #639 (Y: 115 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective Date 2022-04-26 | |
2022-04-26 | Act 716 | |
2022-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 30th, 51st, 52nd |
2022-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 146th, 115th, 49th |
2022-04-04 | House | House Insisted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2022-04-01 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Hopper |