GA HB1419 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Pike County Public Facilities Authority; to provide that the authority is a body corporate and politic and an instrumentality of the State of Georgia; to authorize the authority to acquire, construct, equip, maintain, and operate certain projects, including buildings and facilities for use by Pike County, the Pike County School District, any municipality or other political subdivision located in Pike County, for its governmental, proprietary, and administrative functions; to provide for members of the authority and their terms, organization, and reimbursement; to provide for vacancies; to provide for definitions; to confer powers and impose duties on the authority; to define the scope of the authority's operation; to provide for disposition of property upon dissolution of the authority; to provide for severability; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pike County Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Camp [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #646 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #660 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #660 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Effective Date 2024-05-06 | |
2024-05-06 | Act 659 | |
2024-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Hopper |