GA HB1403 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Mountain Park, approved March 30, 1982 (Ga. L. 1982, p. 3648), as amended, so as to change certain provisions relating to the number of councilmen; to clarify the manner by which a quorum is defined; to clarify the number of votes required for a motion, resolution, or ordinance to pass; to amend the manner in which vacancies in office are filled; to provide for related matters; to state legislative intent; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mountain Park, City of; number of councilmen; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Jerguson [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #674 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 479 | |
2010-05-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-17 | House First Readers |