GA HB1378 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to remove places of worship from unauthorized locations a weapon or long gun may be carried; to provide for online application for weapons carry licenses and renewal licenses; to provide for relief; to amend Code Section 17-5-54 of the O.C.G.A., relating to definitions and disposition of personal property in custody of law enforcement agency; to amend Title 38 of the O.C.G.A., relating to military, emergency management, and veterans affairs; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; remove places of worship from unauthorized locations a weapon or long gun may be carried
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] |
Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Rep. Matt Barton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Hopper |