GA HB134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 15 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county law libraries, so as to repeal a population provision regarding the disposition of law library funds in certain counties; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
County law libraries; repeal a population provision regarding the disposition of law library funds in certain counties
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Beth Moore [D] | Rep. Gregg Kennard [D] |
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #345 (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #97 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #97 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 240 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hopper |