GA HB1321 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to commerce, so as to provide for a litigation bar on governmental entities regarding certain statewide opioid litigation; to provide for legislative findings and intent; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Commerce; litigation bar on governmental entities regarding certain statewide opioid litigation; provide
Sponsors
Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] | Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Hopper |