GA HB1306 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination - Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination - Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the City of Forest Park in the County of Clayton, approved March 24, 1988 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 4409), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 25, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 3545), so as to change the number of councilmember votes for calling a special meeting, transacting business, overriding a veto, transacting emergency business, removing the city manager, removing a director, removing a member of a board, or removing an officer; to remove a certain provision relating to at-large voting; to provide for related matters, to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Forest Park, City of; number of councilmember votes for calling a special meeting; change
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-27 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/37460 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/hb1306_LC_21_1838_a_2.htm |