GA HB13 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Crime Information Center, so as to reduce the fees associated with filing for record restrictions or the inspection and correction of criminal records; to provide a definition; to remove theft from the list of convictions for which restrictions shall not be appropriate; to remove the prohibition on record restrictions in the event multiple charges were tried and some but not all of the charges resulted in an acquittal; to allow the restriction of criminal history record information for convictions of certain misdemeanors and felonies after the completion of the sentence and a conviction-free period of time; to provide date of applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Crime Information Center; fees associated with filing for record restrictions or the inspection and correction of criminal records; reduce
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Winfred Dukes [D] | Rep. Viola Davis [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-29 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |