GA HB13 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, and computation of and exemptions from income taxes, so as to create a tax credit for certain expenses by certain educators; to provide for definitions; to disallow related deductions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for a sunset; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credit; certain expenses by certain educators; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse Hopper
2016-11-28HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback