GA HB1294 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to provide a new charter for the City of Williamson," approved April 7, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 5651), so as to change the terms of office of the mayor and members of the city council; to provide for elections; to provide for the submission of this Act for preclearance under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Williamson, City of; terms of office of mayor and members of city council; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 551 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House First Readers |