GA HB129 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public assistance, so as to expand temporary assistance for needy families eligibility criteria to pregnant women; to revise definitions; to repeal a provision relating to elimination of increment in benefits; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public assistance; expand temporary assistance for needy families eligibility criteria to pregnant women
Sponsors
Rep. Soo Hong [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. David Huddleston [R] | Sen. Mike Hodges [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #199 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 53rd: Senate Vote #198 (Y: 2 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - House - Passage: House Vote #32 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 53rd: Senate Vote #198 (Y: 2 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - House - Passage: House Vote #32 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-02 | Act 228 | |
2023-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-30 | House | House Hopper |