GA HB127 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 45, 12, and 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public officers and employees, conservation and natural resources, and courts, respectively, so as to provide for automatic fee adjustments in cases where funds are not appropriated in certain amounts for specified purposes when certain fees are imposed for such purposes; to provide for definitions, procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for corresponding changes; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public officers; automatic fee adjustment in cases where funds are not appropriated in certain amounts for specified purposes; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House Vote #146 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-01 | House | House Postponed |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/38078 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/128870 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/38078#9714 |