GA HB1255 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for homestead exemptions from City of Gainesville independent school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes for certain residents of that school district who are disabled or who are senior citizens, approved March 19, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4209), as amended, so as to allow any person who is disabled or is 62 to 70 years of age who receives the first exemption of $30,000.00 to automatically receive the second full value exemption upon reaching 70 years of age; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gainesville, City of; ad valorem taxes; educational purposes; provide homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #572 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 597 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-08 | House First Readers |