GA HB1237 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Act 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 2-8-11 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding agricultural commodity commissions, so as to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Agriculture; agricultural commodity commissions; revise a definition
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Cannon [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Steven Meeks [R] |
Rep. Joe Campbell [R] | Rep. Lehman Franklin [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #706 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #551 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #551 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Act 410 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hopper |