GA HB1235 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for vehicle registration of special mobile equipment that are self-propelled cranes in order to authorize operation of such upon public highways; to revise and provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions from certain federal requirements for certain vehicles and equipment; to authorize the issuance of certificates of title for self-propelled cranes; to provide for an annual licensing fee for such equipment; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; vehicle registration of special mobile equipment that are self-propelled cranes in order to authorize operation of such upon public highways; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] |
Rep. Holt Persinger [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #512 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hopper |