GA HB1234 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for conditions, procedures, and limitations for issuance of temporary operating permits for motor vehicles; to amend Code Section 43-47-8 of the O.C.G.A., relating to license applications for used motor vehicle dealers and used motor vehicle parts dealers, prerequisites, license fees, renewal, training or test, supplemental licenses, bonds, insurance, suspension for conviction or false statement, and meetings, so as to provide for issuance or renewal of a license for certain used motor vehicle dealers; to amend Code Section 48-5C-1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to alternative ad valorem tax on motor vehicles, so as to provide for enhanced penalty for an owner of a passive entity that fails to pay alternative ad valorem tax; to provide for a definition; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; conditions, procedures, and limitations for issuance of temporary operating permits; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hopper |