GA HB1232 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alcoholic beverages, so as to authorize local governing authorities to allow Sunday sales at wine bars or wine shops; to provide a definition; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sunday Wine Bar and Wine Shop Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Reeves [R] | Rep. Derrick McCollum [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] |
Rep. Long Tran [D] | Rep. Scott Hilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66924 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/223692 |