GA HB122 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Waynesboro; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for a governing authority of such city and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, vacancies, compensation, expenses, qualifications, prohibitions, conflicts of interest, and suspension and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for inquiries and investigations; to provide for oaths, organization, meetings, quorum, voting, rules, and procedures; to provide for ordinances and codes; to provide for a mayor and mayor pro tempore and certain duties, powers, and other matters relative thereto; to repeal a specific Act; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Waynesboro, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #25 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Vote #22 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Vote #22 - Local Calendar (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Effective Date | |
2011-04-20 | Act 13 | |
2011-04-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-09 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-09 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-03 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-02 | House First Readers |