GA HB1216 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 15 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to serious traffic offenses, so as to provide for enhanced penalties for violations of fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer; to provide for enhanced penalties for fleeing or eluding a police officer during the commission of certain crimes or under certain circumstances; to prohibit the use of a blue light to impersonate a law enforcement officer; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Traffic offenses; enhanced penalties for violations of fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #912 (Y: 96 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #820 (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #601 (Y: 95 N: 62 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #820 (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #601 (Y: 95 N: 62 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 646 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House Hopper |