GA HB1210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions of the Department of Community Affairs, so as to authorize the creation of a data base to make certain information available about multifamily complexes; to provide a definition; to provide for a purpose; to provide for the information the data base shall contain; to provide for public access to the data base; to provide for the promulgation of rules for the development, management, and maintenance of the data base; to prohibit the department from posting information on the data base that is not voluntarily provided; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Affairs, Department of; authorize creation of data base to make certain information available about multifamily complexes
Sponsors
Rep. Marvin Lim [D] | Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] |
Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66843 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/223413 |