GA HB12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to controlled substances, so as to provide that possession of certain quantities of marijuana constitute a misdemeanor; to change provisions relating to punishment; to amend Title 15, Title 16, Chapter 7 of Title 17, and Code Section 36-32-6 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts, crimes and offenses, pretrial proceedings, and municipal court jurisdiction in marijuana possession cases; to amend Code Section 35-3-33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to powers and duties of the Georgia Crime Information Center generally, so as to revise provisions relating to obtaining fingerprints and other identifying data on persons arrested or taken into custody for misdemeanor marijuana possession; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled substances; possession of certain quantities of marijuana constitute a misdemeanor; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Winfred Dukes [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] | Rep. Samuel Park [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-29 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |