GA HB1177 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from City of Jefferson independent school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in the amount of $10,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for certain residents of that school district who are 62 years of age or over and an additional homestead exemption in the amount of $20,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for certain residents of that school district who are 65 years of age or over and whose net income, excluding certain retirement income, does not exceed $18,000.00, approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4353), as amended, so as to require yearly income statements to continue to receive the exemption; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jefferson, City of; independent school district ad valorem tax homestead exemption; require yearly income statements to continue to receive exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 527 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-15 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-15 | House | House Hopper |