GA HB1174 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of members of the Board of Education of Morgan County, approved March 28, 1985 (Ga. L. 1985, p. 4643), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 5, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 3948), so as to change the composition and description of the education districts from which members of the board of education are elected; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Morgan County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #501 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #496 (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #496 (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 467 | |
2022-02-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Hopper |