GA HB1164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for a supplement to the compensation, expenses, and allowances of the district attorney of the Atlantic Judicial Circuit, approved April 11, 1979 (Ga. L. 1979, p. 584), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 26, 1980 (Ga. L. 1980, p. 1222), so as to provide for the minimum supplement each county in the circuit shall provide to the judges of the superior courts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Atlantic Judicial Circuit; Superior Court; provide for the minimum supplement each county in the circuit shall provide to the judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/58298 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/193079 |