GA HB115 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 7 of Chapter 14 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to foreclosure in general, so as to provide, under certain circumstances, for an opportunity, prior to foreclosure, for a debtor to cure a foreclosure and bring the debt current by making all past due payments along with any late fees and charges; to provide for a short title; to provide for a method of payment; to provide for a limitation; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Foreclosure Cure Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. LaDawn Jones [D] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Rep. Darryl Jordan [D] | Rep. Pedro Marin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |