GA HB1146 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ground-water use generally, so as to require the Environmental Protection Division of the Department of Natural Resources to issue water permits to private companies in areas where no public service can be provided within a period of 12 months; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to provide for automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Natural Resources, Department of; EPD to issue water permits to private companies in areas where no public service can be provided within a period of 12 months; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #828 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #657 (Y: 105 N: 58 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #657 (Y: 105 N: 58 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-06 | House | House Hopper |