GA HB1120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the consolidation of Richmond County and the City of Augusta, approved March 27, 1995 (Ga. L. 1995, p. 3648), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 8, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 3769), so as to change the description of the commission districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Augusta, City of; Richmond County; change description of districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61545 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/204573 |