GA HB1103 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-167 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to separately stated fees in a rental agreement, so as to revise the definition of "heavy-duty equipment motor vehicle" for the purposes of said Code section; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; heavy-duty equipment motor vehicle; revise definition
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #856 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #667 (Y: 126 N: 12 NV: 20 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #667 (Y: 126 N: 12 NV: 20 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 764 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |