GA HB1102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2A of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to homestead option sales and use tax, so as to provide for a revised homestead option sales tax; to provide for a revised distribution of the proceeds from the levy of an equalized homestead option sales and use tax; to provide for the levy of a special purpose local option sales and use tax in certain counties; to provide for elector petitions and referenda; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revised Homestead Option Sales and Use Tax Act of 2020; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #770 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #615 (Y: 91 N: 70 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #616 (Y: 68 N: 87 NV: 9 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #615 (Y: 91 N: 70 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #616 (Y: 68 N: 87 NV: 9 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 570 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House Hopper |