GA HB110 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of fireworks, so as to provide for the sale of consumer fireworks; to provide for definitions; to provide for licensing; to revise penalties; to amend Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to specific, business, and occupation taxes, so as to provide for an excise tax on the sale of consumer fireworks; to provide for criminal penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fireworks; provide for sale of consumer fireworks; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #397 (Y: 124 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #317 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Vote #141 (Y: 119 N: 49 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01 Effective Date
2015-05-05 Act 50
2015-05-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2015-04-09HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2015-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2015-03-31SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-03-31SenateSenate Taken from Table
2015-03-31SenateSenate Tabled
2015-03-31SenateSenate Third Read
2015-03-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2015-03-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-03-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-03-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-03-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2015-03-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-01-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-01-28HouseHouse First Readers
2015-01-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback