GA HB1096 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions of professions and businesses, so as to establish on behalf of professional licensing boards under the jurisdiction of the office of the Secretary of State a continuing education tracking solution to monitor compliance of licensees with applicable continuing education requirements; to provide for definitions; to require compliance with continuing education requirements prior to the issuance of certain licenses; to provide for the adoption of rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professional licensing boards; continuing education tracking solution to monitor compliance of licensees with applicable continuing education requirements; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Becky Evans [D] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Sen. Carden Summers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #592 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-31 | House | House Hopper |