GA HB1093 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding specific, business, and occupation taxes, so as to require any municipality or county which imposes certain occupation taxes or regulatory fees to collect from taxpayers certain information and to provide electronically annual information to the Department of Revenue in connection therewith; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for powers, duties, and authority of the Department of Revenue and the state revenue commissioner; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Occupation taxes; county provide electronic information to Department of Revenue; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #844 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 555 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-17 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-16 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-08 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-05 | House First Readers |