GA HB108 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Clayton County, approved January 28, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 2032), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 11, 1979 (Ga. L. 1979, p. 3838) and by an Act approved April 16, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 4665), so as to provide for rotation of the office of chief judge among the judges of said court; to provide for refusal to serve as chief judge; to provide for filling of vacancies in the office of chief judge; to provide for transaction of court business; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County; State Court; provide rotation of office of chief judge
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House Vote #22 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54472 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/180128 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54472#16496 |