GA HB1069 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 37 of the O.C.G.A., relating to examination, treatment, etc., for mental illness, so as to provide for the licensure of adult mental health programs; to provide for inspection by the Department of Community Health; to provide for an annual report; to provide for criminal background checks; to provide for oversight by the disability services ombudsman; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mental health; adult mental health programs; provide licensure
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #735 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #672 (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #672 (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-06 | Act 829 | |
2022-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House Hopper |