GA HB1067 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-23-12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the limited licenses for insurance agents, agencies, subagents, counselors, and adjustors, so as to provide for the comprehensive revision of provisions regarding the issuance and regulation of limited licenses to sell portable electronics insurance; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Portable electronics insurance; issuance and regulation of limited licenses to sell; provide for comprehensive revision of provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #847 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 149 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #819 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #625 - Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #819 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #625 - Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-07 | Act 776 | |
2012-05-07 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-17 | House First Readers |