GA HB1034 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to holidays and observances, so as to designate the fourth Friday in November of each year as "National Sugarcane Syrup Day" in Georgia; to provide legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State holidays; fourth Friday in November as National Sugarcane Syrup Day; designate
Sponsors
Rep. Lehman Franklin [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Leesa Hagan [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #455 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hopper |