GA HB1028 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of members of the Board of Education of Cobb County, approved March 28, 1974 (Ga. L. 1974, p. 3516), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 20, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5570), so as to change the description of the education districts of such board; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for the manner of election; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit: Senate Vote #546 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #545 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion To Commit: Senate Vote #522 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #517 (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #516 (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Move From Lleg To Gaff: House Vote #483 (Y: 97 N: 68 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #545 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion To Commit: Senate Vote #522 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #517 (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #516 (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Move From Lleg To Gaff: House Vote #483 (Y: 97 N: 68 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 561 | |
2022-03-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-14 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |