GA HB1021 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 10 of Chapter 21 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Driver's Education Commission, so as to increase the additional penalty for violation of traffic laws or ordinances under "Joshua's Law"; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Driver's Education Commission; increase the additional penalty for violation of traffic laws or ordinance under "Joshua's Law"
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #614 (Y: 151 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57739 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/190925 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57739#17661 |