GA HB1021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to create the office of Commissioner of Roads and Revenues in and for the County of Pulaski, State of Georgia," approved August 18, 1919 (Ga. L. 1919, p. 729), as amended, so as to provide for the filling of vacancies in such office; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pulaski County; Office of Commissioner of Roads and Revenues; provide for filling of vacancies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53424 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/175683 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53424#16002 |