GA HB1021 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the composition of the Board of Education for Evans County, approved March 26, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4782), as amended, particularly by an Act approved June 3, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4281), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evans County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #530 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Vote #525 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Vote #525 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-05 | Act 355 | |
2012-03-05 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-23 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |