GA HB1017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Greensboro, approved March 16, 1978 (Ga. L. 1978, p. 3932), as amended, so as to change the corporate limits; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Greensboro, City of; change corporate limits
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Vote #684 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Vote #684 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 503 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House Hopper |